NJ S3239 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4702 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4702 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Hunger-Free Campus Act"; requires Secretary of Higher Education to establish grant program to address food insecurity among students enrolled in public institutions of higher education; appropriates $1 million.
Title
"Hunger-Free Campus Act"; requires Secretary of Higher Education to establish grant program to address food insecurity among students enrolled in public institutions of higher education; appropriates $1 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4702 (1R) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4702 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.89.