NJ S3247 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates cap on cost of SDA district school facilities projects that may be constructed by district and included in capital outlay budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates cap on cost of SDA district school facilities projects that may be constructed by district and included in capital outlay budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4928 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2015, c.257.
2016-01-11AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-6-0)
2016-01-11AssemblySubstituted for A4928
2016-01-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2016-01-07SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2015-11-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-11-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4928 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3247

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback