NJ S3249 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S816
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires firearm retailers to sell personalized handguns.
Title
Requires firearm retailers to sell personalized handguns.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4717 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (43-30-1) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4717 |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3249 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4717 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3249
A4717 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3249