NJ S3284 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S284
Note: Carry Foward to future A1382
Note: Carry Foward to future A1382
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for accidental death benefit if death of TPAF member and certain PERS members is caused by COVID-19.
Title
Provides for accidental death benefit if death of TPAF member and certain PERS members is caused by COVID-19.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3284 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3284 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5011 (Same As) 2020-11-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3284 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5011 (Same As) 2020-11-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee