NJ S3322 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4533
Note: Carry Foward to future S2868
Note: Carry Foward to future S2868
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for advocate in criminal cases concerning welfare or care of animal.*
Title
Provides for advocate in criminal cases concerning welfare or care of animal.*
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Scutari) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3322 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3322 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4840 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3322 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4840 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee