NJ S3327 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Commission on Latino and Hispanic Heritage in DOE.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Commission on Latino and Hispanic Heritage in DOE.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2019-03-14SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4995 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback