NJ S3348 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires home health agencies and specialty pharmacies providing services related to bleeding episodes associated with hemophilia to comply with certain minimum practice standards. *
Title
Requires home health agencies and specialty pharmacies providing services related to bleeding episodes associated with hemophilia to comply with certain minimum practice standards. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4990 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.322. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4990 (ACS) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4990 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3348 (SCS)