NJ S3375 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Approved P.L.2019, c.133.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Approved P.L.2019, c.133.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes maternal health care pilot program to evaluate shared decision-making tool developed by DOH and used by hospitals providing maternity services, and by birthing centers.
Title
Establishes maternal health care pilot program to evaluate shared decision-making tool developed by DOH and used by hospitals providing maternity services, and by birthing centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4936 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4936 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.133. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4936 (1R) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Carter) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4936 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3375 (2R)