NJ S3376 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4938 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4938 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to establish "My Life, My Plan" program to support women of childbearing age in developing reproductive life plan.
Title
Requires DOH to establish "My Life, My Plan" program to support women of childbearing age in developing reproductive life plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A4938 (2R) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Ruiz) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Ruiz) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4938 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.236.