NJ S3393 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs State Agriculture Development Committee to establish pilot program to allow special occasion events to be conducted on preserved farmland under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs State Agriculture Development Committee to establish pilot program to allow special occasion events to be conducted on preserved farmland under certain conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5157 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback