NJ S3415 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4999 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4999 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires filing of certain contact information of creditors with residential mortgage foreclosure complaint and lis pendens.
Title
Requires filing of certain contact information of creditors with residential mortgage foreclosure complaint and lis pendens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4999 (1R) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Oroho) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4999 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.66.