NJ S3443 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4223 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4223 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Treasurer to pay county prosecutor's expenses for overseeing certain law enforcement agencies.
Title
Requires State Treasurer to pay county prosecutor's expenses for overseeing certain law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A4223 (1R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4223 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.233.