NJ S3455 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5031 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5031 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospital emergency departments to ask person of childbearing age about recent pregnancy history.*
Title
Requires hospital emergency departments to ask person of childbearing age about recent pregnancy history.*
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5031 (3R) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Ruiz) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5031 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.498.