NJ S3467 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5023 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5023 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from DOT permitting requirements certain signs not located in protected areas that have been approved by municipality.
Title
Exempts from DOT permitting requirements certain signs not located in protected areas that have been approved by municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5023 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5023 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.495.