NJ S3498 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1838
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A4978 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A4978 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits online education services from using and disclosing certain information, engaging in targeted advertising, and requires deletion of certain information in certain circumstances.*
Title
Prohibits online education services from using and disclosing certain information, engaging in targeted advertising, and requires deletion of certain information in certain circumstances.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted by A4978 (3R) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3498 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A4978 (3R)
A4978 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.494.
A4978 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.494.