NJ S3499 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1247
Note: Carry Foward to future A2779
Note: Carry Foward to future A2779
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-12-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-12-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain local government utilities to impose additional connection fees; requires certain new credits and reductions for these fees.
Title
Authorizes certain local government utilities to impose additional connection fees; requires certain new credits and reductions for these fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] |
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Joseph Kyrillos [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5250 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-12-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5250 |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3499 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-12-0)
S3499 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-12-0)
A5250 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3499
S3499 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-12-0)
A5250 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3499