NJ S3502 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows alcoholic beverages to be consumed outdoors in Atlantic City Tourism District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows alcoholic beverages to be consumed outdoors in Atlantic City Tourism District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2019-06-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5415 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback