NJ S3522 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A707
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5029 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5029 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires New Jersey Office on Minority and Multicultural Health to study racial disparities on sexual and reproductive health of African-American women.
Title
Requires New Jersey Office on Minority and Multicultural Health to study racial disparities on sexual and reproductive health of African-American women.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5029 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3522 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5029 (1R)
A5029 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.497.
A5029 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.497.