NJ S3528 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes process to obtain judgement of adoption for civil union partner or spouse of natural or legal parent of child when that person is named as parent on child's birth certificate.
Title
Establishes process to obtain judgement of adoption for civil union partner or spouse of natural or legal parent of child when that person is named as parent on child's birth certificate.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5396 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.323. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-3) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A5396 |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5396 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3528