NJ S3529 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A4095
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A4095
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants veteran discharged under honorable conditions right to peddler's license.
Title
Grants veteran discharged under honorable conditions right to peddler's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Substituted by A4095 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4095 (Same As) 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.211.