NJ S3533 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S799
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public institutions of higher education to temporarily suspend collection of tuition and other payments from students impacted by shutdown of federal government.
Title
Requires public institutions of higher education to temporarily suspend collection of tuition and other payments from students impacted by shutdown of federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Cunningham) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3533 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5144 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5144 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee