NJ S3534 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Commits $3 million from Supplemental Workforce Fund for Basic Skill to NJ Community College Consortium for Workforce and Economic Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commits $3 million from Supplemental Workforce Fund for Basic Skill to NJ Community College Consortium for Workforce and Economic Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5163 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
2018-01-08AssemblySubstituted for A5163
2018-01-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-01-05SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2017-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-12-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-11-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5163 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3534

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback