NJ S3554 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A5162 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A5162 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits county board of chosen freeholders to increase membership of county board of elections.*
Title
Permits county board of chosen freeholders to increase membership of county board of elections.*
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5162 (1R) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reconsidered Vote (25-5) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5162 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.191.