NJ S3594 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S59
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.286.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.286.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides certain employment protections for National Guard members employed in New Jersey.
Title
Provides certain employment protections for National Guard members employed in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5819 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.286. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A5819 |
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3594 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.286.
A5819 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3594
A5819 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3594