NJ S362 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1751

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Approved P.L.2019, c.132.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that deed restrictions on affordable housing units are not extinguished by foreclosure proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that deed restrictions on affordable housing units are not extinguished by foreclosure proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3833 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.132.
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-1)
2019-06-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2019-06-10SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2019-05-30Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0)
2019-05-13SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-2)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A3833 (1R)
2019-01-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
2018-06-07SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-04-12SenateSenate Amendment (30-0) (Rice)
2018-03-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1751 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3833 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S362 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback