NJ S3620 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-21-10)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-21-10)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes PERS membership eligibility for certain elected public officials and provides for PERS reenrollment.
Title
Changes PERS membership eligibility for certain elected public officials and provides for PERS reenrollment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5322 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-21-10) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5322 (1R) |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-9) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5322 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3620 (1R)