NJ S3622 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3325
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Mountainview Youth Correctional Facility as "William H. Fauver Youth Correctional Facility."
Title
Renames Mountainview Youth Correctional Facility as "William H. Fauver Youth Correctional Facility."
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A1305 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1305 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.329.
A3325 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3325 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee