NJ S3661 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies assessment payment and election participation requirements in planned real estate developments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies assessment payment and election participation requirements in planned real estate developments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Waive Rule 23:4 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5043 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-27SenateReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2019-08-26AssemblyPassed by the Senate (31-0)
2019-08-26AssemblyMotion Waive Rule 23:4 (30-0) (Singleton)
2019-08-26Assembly2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (30-0)
2019-08-23AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-2-1)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A5043 (1R)
2019-06-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
2019-06-10SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-05-30SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Singleton)
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5043 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3661 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback