NJ S368 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2837
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.76.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.76.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes political subdivisions to set aside 0.5 percent of public works funds to recruit and train women and minorities and promote local hiring.
Title
Authorizes political subdivisions to set aside 0.5 percent of public works funds to recruit and train women and minorities and promote local hiring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4817 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.76. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-1-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4817 |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2837 (Carry Over) 2016-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4817 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S368
A4817 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S368