NJ S3682 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5293 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5293 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to laws governing remediation of contaminated sites.
Title
Makes various changes to laws governing remediation of contaminated sites.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5293 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5293 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.263.