NJ S3686 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5322 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5322 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program for cultivation, handling, processing, transport, and sale of hemp; repeals New Jersey Industrial Hemp Pilot Program.
Title
Establishes program for cultivation, handling, processing, transport, and sale of hemp; repeals New Jersey Industrial Hemp Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5322 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5322 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.238.