NJ S371 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2923
Note: Carryover of previous S2923

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes two-generational school readiness and workforce development pilot program for certain low-income households.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes two-generational school readiness and workforce development pilot program for certain low-income households.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (31-1)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2923 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2923 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.244.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback