NJ S372 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2924
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Education to develop guidelines to encourage high school students to participate in apprenticeship training.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Education to develop guidelines to encourage high school students to participate in apprenticeship training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A131 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.96. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A131 |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2924 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A131 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S372
A131 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S372