NJ S374 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3220
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Director of Division of Investment to attempt to use qualified minority and women-owned financial institutions to provide brokerage and investment management services.
Title
Requires Director of Division of Investment to attempt to use qualified minority and women-owned financial institutions to provide brokerage and investment management services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4415 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.2. |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-4-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4415 |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3220 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4415 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S374
A4415 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S374