NJ S3799 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S397
Note: Carry Foward to future A681
Note: Carry Foward to future A681
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands scope of law prohibiting age discrimination.
Title
Expands scope of law prohibiting age discrimination.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3799 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S3799 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A5395 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S3799 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A5395 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee