NJ S381 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A443
Note: Carry Foward to future A1355
Note: Carry Over of previous S145
Note: Carry Foward to future A1355
Note: Carry Over of previous S145
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes animal abuser registry; prohibits person convicted of criminal animal cruelty violation from owning, keeping, or harboring any animal, and establishes enforcement mechanisms therefor.*
Title
Establishes animal abuser registry; prohibits person convicted of criminal animal cruelty violation from owning, keeping, or harboring any animal, and establishes enforcement mechanisms therefor.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S381 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S381 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S145 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4114 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S381 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S145 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4114 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S381 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/381_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S381 |