NJ S3813 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1136
Note: Carry Foward to future A2216
Note: Carry Foward to future A2216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands "Law Against Discrimination" to apply to health programs and activities and to prohibit discrimination based on association with individuals in protected classes.
Title
Expands "Law Against Discrimination" to apply to health programs and activities and to prohibit discrimination based on association with individuals in protected classes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-1) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3813 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3813 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A5510 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3813 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A5510 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading