NJ S3820 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5457 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted by A5457 (1R)
2019-06-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5457 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.193.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback