NJ S3824 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell surplus real property located in City of Trenton, Mercer County.
Title
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell surplus real property located in City of Trenton, Mercer County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5381 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5381 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.140.