NJ S3825 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1807
Note: Carry Foward to future A3456
Note: Carry Foward to future A3456
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes tuition reimbursement program for students enrolled in certain private postsecondary educational schools.
Title
Establishes tuition reimbursement program for students enrolled in certain private postsecondary educational schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3825 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3825 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A5141 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3825 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A5141 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading