NJ S3833 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes uniform standard for acceptable proof of veteran status for veteran's ID cards and various State and local programs.
Title
Establishes uniform standard for acceptable proof of veteran status for veteran's ID cards and various State and local programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5344 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5344 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.500.