NJ S3880 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4788 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4788 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes expedited construction inspection program.
Title
Establishes expedited construction inspection program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4788 (1R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4788 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session