NJ S3928 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3787

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Andrzejczak)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes NJ "Landowner of the Year" award program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes NJ "Landowner of the Year" award program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Andrzejczak)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1040 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Andrzejczak)
A3787 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback