NJ S396 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S110
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.57.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.57.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forbids members of the State Investment Council from voting on transactions concerning investment with which a member has certain financial or familial conflicts and requires removal for violations thereof.
Title
Forbids members of the State Investment Council from voting on transactions concerning investment with which a member has certain financial or familial conflicts and requires removal for violations thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3840 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.57. |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A3840 |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S110 (Carry Over) 2017-10-05 - Senate Amendment (30-0) (Pennacchio)
A3840 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Substituted by S396 (1R)
A3840 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Substituted by S396 (1R)