NJ S3975 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that State employee serve as Equal Employment Opportunity and Affirmative Action officer for gubernatorial transitions.
Title
Requires that State employee serve as Equal Employment Opportunity and Affirmative Action officer for gubernatorial transitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A5624 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5624 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.344.