NJ S3976 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires payment of expenses related to background investigations for certain gubernatorial transition positions.
Title
Requires payment of expenses related to background investigations for certain gubernatorial transition positions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A5625 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5625 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.345.