NJ S4035 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1918
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes Fiscal Year 2020 supplemental appropriation of $1,700,000 for Thomas Edison State University.
Title
Makes Fiscal Year 2020 supplemental appropriation of $1,700,000 for Thomas Edison State University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5702 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-22-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A5702 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-13) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4035 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A5702 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4035
A5702 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4035