NJ S406 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S282
Note: Carry Foward to future A2787
Note: Carry Over of previous S3045
Note: Carry Foward to future A2787
Note: Carry Over of previous S3045
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates New Jersey Innocence Study and Review Commission.
Title
Creates New Jersey Innocence Study and Review Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S406 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S406 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3045 (Carry Over) 2017-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A341 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S406 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3045 (Carry Over) 2017-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A341 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S406 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/406_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S406 |