NJ S408 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1388
Note: Carry Foward to future A1947
Note: Carry Over of previous S3388
Note: Carry Foward to future A1947
Note: Carry Over of previous S3388
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs school districts to establish policies and require training for employees on issues regarding child sexual abuse.
Title
Directs school districts to establish policies and require training for employees on issues regarding child sexual abuse.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S408 (Carry Over) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S408 (Carry Over) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3388 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4231 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S408 (Carry Over) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3388 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4231 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee