NJ S4083 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1782
Note: Carry Foward to future A2365
Note: Carry Foward to future A2365
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriations of $1.5 million for Bright Side Manor in Teaneck to fund capital improvement costs.
Title
Makes supplemental appropriations of $1.5 million for Bright Side Manor in Teaneck to fund capital improvement costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-14) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4083 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4083 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5941 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4083 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5941 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee